|
发表于 27-7-2019 06:35 AM
|
显示全部楼层
Date of change | 31 Jul 2019 | Name | GEN (R) TAN SRI DATO' MOHD GHAZALI BIN HJ. CHE MAT | Age | 88 | Gender | Male | Nationality | Malaysia | Designation | Chairman | Directorate | Non Independent and Non Executive | Type of change | Resignation | Reason | To retire from office. | Details of any disagreement that he/she has with the Board of Directors | No | Whether there are any matters that need to be brought to the attention of shareholders | No | QualificationsNo | Qualifications | Major/Field of Study | Institute/University | Additional Information | 1 | Others | Military | Command and Staff College, Quetta, Pakistan | 1961 | 2 | Others | Military | Royal Military Academy, Sandhurst, United Kingdom | 1955 | 3 | Others | Officer Cadet | Officer Cadet School Eaton Hall, United Kingdom | 1953 |
Working experience and occupation | - Tan Sri Ghazali held various senior command and staff positions in the Malaysian Armed Forces, the last being Chief of the Armed Forces from 1985 to 1987.- Tan Sri Ghazali was also the Chairman of Lembaga Tabung Angkatan Tentera from 23 February 1988 until 22 February 2007.- He has been Chairman of Boustead Holdings Berhad since 3 December 1990. He was also the Chairman of Boustead Plantations Berhad. | Family relationship with any director and/or major shareholder of the listed issuer | Nil | Any conflict of interests that he/she has with the listed issuer | Nil | Details of any interest in the securities of the listed issuer or its subsidiaries | 1) 2,184,000 ordinary shares in the listed subsidiary, Boustead Plantations Berhad.2) 220,000 ordinary shares in the listed subsidiary, Pharmaniaga Berhad. |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
发表于 27-7-2019 06:36 AM
|
显示全部楼层
Date of change | 31 Jul 2019 | Name | DATO' SRI GHAZALI BIN MOHD ALI | Age | 71 | Gender | Male | Nationality | Malaysia | Designation | Director | Directorate | Executive | Type of change | Resignation | Reason | To pursue other interest. | Details of any disagreement that he/she has with the Board of Directors | No | Whether there are any matters that need to be brought to the attention of shareholders | No | QualificationsNo | Qualifications | Major/Field of Study | Institute/University | Additional Information | 1 | Professional Qualification | Fellow | Malaysian Institute of Planners | | 2 | Others | Town and Regional Planning | Western Australia Institute of Technology, Perth, Australia | 1970 |
Working experience and occupation | - Prior to joining Boustead Holdings Berhad, Dato' Sri Ghazali held several positions in property industry for more than 30 years.- He has served as Managing Director of Syarikat Perumahan Pegawai Kerajaan Sdn Bhd, Property Director of Island & Peninsular Berhad as well as the Deputy Director General of The Urban Development Authority of Malaysia.- Currently, he is Divisional Director, Property, Boustead Holdings Berhad. | Family relationship with any director and/or major shareholder of the listed issuer | Nil | Any conflict of interests that he/she has with the listed issuer | Nil | Details of any interest in the securities of the listed issuer or its subsidiaries | 1) 1,727,600 ordinary shares in the listed subsidiary, Boustead Plantations Berhad.2) 143,000 ordinary shares in the listed subsidiary, Pharmaniaga Berhad. |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
发表于 30-8-2019 02:52 AM
|
显示全部楼层
本帖最后由 icy97 于 30-8-2019 06:51 AM 编辑
连续两个季度蒙亏后 Boustead实现盈利
Syahirah Syed Jaafar/theedgemarkets.com
August 28, 2019 20:00 pm +08
https://www.theedgemarkets.com/article/连续两个季度蒙亏后-boustead实现盈利
(吉隆坡28日讯)连续两个季度蒙亏后,Boustead Holdings Bhd截至6月杪第二季实现盈利,得益于脱售槟城威北县种植地获利1亿1950万令吉。
该集团今日向大马交易所报备,截至6月杪次季净赚2430万令吉,或每股1.2仙,上财年同期则净亏2760万令吉,或每股1.36仙。
季度营业额扬4.7%至25亿4000万令吉,同期报24亿3000万令吉。
这带动该集团在2019财政年首半年转亏为盈,录得190万令吉的净利,同期则净亏2150万令吉;营业额从47亿3000万令吉,增6.8%至50亿5000万令吉。
Boustead指出,不计脱售收益,税前盈利则下降,主要因为财务成本高企,以及重工业和种植业务蒙受营运亏损。
该集团警告,下半年的前景预计将充满挑战,因考量全球贸易争端持续,且不确定性可能也会继续加剧。
(编译:陈慧珊)
SUMMARY OF KEY FINANCIAL INFORMATION
30 Jun 2019 |
| INDIVIDUAL PERIOD | CUMULATIVE PERIOD | CURRENT YEAR QUARTER | PRECEDING YEAR
CORRESPONDING
QUARTER | CURRENT YEAR TO DATE | PRECEDING YEAR
CORRESPONDING
PERIOD | 30 Jun 2019 | 30 Jun 2018 | 30 Jun 2019 | 30 Jun 2018 | $$'000 | $$'000 | $$'000 | $$'000 |
1 | Revenue | 2,544,100 | 2,430,900 | 5,050,800 | 4,731,200 | 2 | Profit/(loss) before tax | 118,900 | 20,400 | 170,400 | 90,700 | 3 | Profit/(loss) for the period | 84,100 | -1,300 | 95,500 | 36,800 | 4 | Profit/(loss) attributable to ordinary equity holders of the parent | 24,300 | -27,600 | 1,900 | -21,500 | 5 | Basic earnings/(loss) per share (Subunit) | 1.20 | -1.36 | 0.09 | -1.06 | 6 | Proposed/Declared dividend per share (Subunit) | 0.00 | 1.00 | 0.00 | 3.50 |
|
| AS AT END OF CURRENT QUARTER | AS AT PRECEDING FINANCIAL YEAR END | 7
| Net assets per share attributable to ordinary equity holders of the parent ($$) | 2.6700 | 2.6500
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
发表于 8-9-2019 05:23 AM
|
显示全部楼层
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
发表于 20-3-2020 06:18 AM
|
显示全部楼层
SUMMARY OF KEY FINANCIAL INFORMATION
30 Sep 2019 |
| INDIVIDUAL PERIOD | CUMULATIVE PERIOD | CURRENT YEAR QUARTER | PRECEDING YEAR
CORRESPONDING
QUARTER | CURRENT YEAR TO DATE | PRECEDING YEAR
CORRESPONDING
PERIOD | 30 Sep 2019 | 30 Sep 2018 | 30 Sep 2019 | 30 Sep 2018 | $$'000 | $$'000 | $$'000 | $$'000 |
1 | Revenue | 2,734,700 | 2,602,400 | 7,785,500 | 7,333,600 | 2 | Profit/(loss) before tax | -156,400 | 63,800 | 14,000 | 154,500 | 3 | Profit/(loss) for the period | -187,500 | 40,100 | -92,000 | 76,900 | 4 | Profit/(loss) attributable to ordinary equity holders of the parent | -155,000 | 7,300 | -153,100 | -14,200 | 5 | Basic earnings/(loss) per share (Subunit) | -7.65 | 0.36 | -7.55 | -0.70 | 6 | Proposed/Declared dividend per share (Subunit) | 0.00 | 1.50 | 0.00 | 5.00 |
|
| AS AT END OF CURRENT QUARTER | AS AT PRECEDING FINANCIAL YEAR END | 7
| Net assets per share attributable to ordinary equity holders of the parent ($$) | 2.5900 | 2.6500
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
发表于 3-5-2020 08:47 AM
|
显示全部楼层
SUMMARY OF KEY FINANCIAL INFORMATION
31 Dec 2019 |
| INDIVIDUAL PERIOD | CUMULATIVE PERIOD | CURRENT YEAR QUARTER | PRECEDING YEAR
CORRESPONDING
QUARTER | CURRENT YEAR TO DATE | PRECEDING YEAR
CORRESPONDING
PERIOD | 31 Dec 2019 | 31 Dec 2018 | 31 Dec 2019 | 31 Dec 2018 | $$'000 | $$'000 | $$'000 | $$'000 |
1 | Revenue | 2,548,400 | 2,852,800 | 10,333,900 | 10,186,400 | 2 | Profit/(loss) before tax | -1,349,800 | -653,000 | -1,335,800 | -498,500 | 3 | Profit/(loss) for the period | -1,294,300 | -650,100 | -1,386,300 | -573,200 | 4 | Profit/(loss) attributable to ordinary equity holders of the parent | -1,125,700 | -540,100 | -1,278,800 | -554,300 | 5 | Basic earnings/(loss) per share (Subunit) | -55.54 | -26.65 | -63.09 | -27.35 | 6 | Proposed/Declared dividend per share (Subunit) | 0.00 | 0.00 | 0.00 | 5.00 |
|
| AS AT END OF CURRENT QUARTER | AS AT PRECEDING FINANCIAL YEAR END | 7
| Net assets per share attributable to ordinary equity holders of the parent ($$) | 1.8500 | 2.4700
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
发表于 2-6-2020 12:59 AM
|
显示全部楼层
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
发表于 2-6-2020 01:10 AM
|
显示全部楼层
Date of change | 01 May 2020 | Name | DATUK SERI MOHAMED KHALED NORDIN | Age | 61 | Gender | Male | Nationality | Malaysia | Designation | Chairman | Directorate | Non Independent and Non Executive | Type of change | Appointment | QualificationsNo | Qualifications | Major/Field of Study | Institute/University | Additional Information | 1 | Degree | LLB Honours | Universiti Malaya | 1982 |
Working experience and occupation | YBhg. Datuk Seri Khaled started his career in 1983 and joined politics in 1990.Positions held:- 1983 : Legal Executive, Petronas- 1983 to 1986 : Political Secretary, Federal Territory Minister.- 1986 to 1987 : Political Secretary, Social Welfare Minister.- 1990 to 2004 : Member of Parliament, Johor Bahru; and : Deputy Works Minister.- 2004 to 2008 : Minister of Entrepreneur and Co-operatives Development.- 2004 to 2013 : Member of Parliament, Pasir Gudang Johor.- 2008 to 2013 : Minister of Higher Education.- 2013 to 2018 : State Assembly Member for Permas, Johor; and : 15th Chief Minister (Menteri Besar) of Johor.YBhg. Datuk Seri Khaled was the Chairman of Johor Corporation Berhad, its group companies and several state-owned entities. |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
发表于 6-7-2020 06:35 AM
|
显示全部楼层
Type | Announcement | Subject | OTHERS | Description | BOUSTEAD HOLDINGS BERHAD ("BHB" OR "COMPANY")POSSIBLE PRIVATISATION OF THE COMPANY | The Company wishes to announce that Lembaga Tabung Angkatan Tentera ("LTAT"), the controlling shareholder of the Company, has issued a press notice to the media stating that it is considering a proposal to privatise the Company ("Proposal").
SHAREHOLDERS ARE ADVISED TO EXERCISE CAUTION AND SEEK APPROPRIATE ADVICE WHEN DEALING IN THE ORDINARY SHARES OF BHB SINCE THERE IS NO CERTAINTY THAT LTAT WILL PROCEED WITH THE PROPOSAL.
At this juncture, the Company has not received any offer relating to this Proposal from LTAT or any other parties.
This announcement is dated 28 May 2020
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
发表于 8-7-2020 07:38 AM
|
显示全部楼层
Type | Announcement | Subject | OTHERS | Description | BOUSTEAD HOLDINGS BERHAD ("BHB" OR "COMPANY")POSSIBLE PRIVATISATION OF THE COMPANY ("PROPOSAL") | The Company wishes to announce that following the earlier announcement regarding the Proposal, the Company had sought clarification from Lembaga Tabung Angkatan Tentera (“LTAT”), which had confirmed that LTAT is considering a proposal to privatise the Company. The Proposal is subject to, among others, the finalisation of the structure of the Proposal, the requisite funding for the Proposal and the required regulatory approval(s) for the Proposal.
THE COMPANY WISHES TO HIGHLIGHT THAT THE PRESS NOTICE ISSUED BY LTAT DOES NOT AMOUNT TO A FIRM INTENTION BY LTAT TO UNDERTAKE THE PROPOSAL. ACCORDINGLY, THERE CAN BE NO CERTAINTY THAT LTAT WILL PROCEED WITH THE PROPOSAL.
If LTAT decides to proceed with the Proposal, LTAT expects to propose an offer price of RM0.80 per ordinary share in BHB (“BHB Share”). This offer price is indicative only and non-binding. The final offer price in relation to the Proposal (if undertaken) is subject to finalisation by LTAT.
LTAT will make subsequent announcement(s) on any material development in relation to the Proposal in accordance with the Rules on Take-overs, Mergers and Compulsory Acquisitions.
SHAREHOLDERS ARE ADVISED TO EXERCISE CAUTION AND SEEK APPROPRIATE ADVICE WHEN DEALING IN BHB SHARES SINCE THERE IS NO CERTAINTY THAT LTAT WILL PROCEED WITH THE PROPOSAL.
At this juncture, the Company has not received any offer relating to the Proposal from LTAT or any other parties.
This announcement is dated 29 May 2020.
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
发表于 27-8-2020 09:54 PM
|
显示全部楼层
本帖最后由 icy97 于 1-1-2021 09:05 AM 编辑
SUMMARY OF KEY FINANCIAL INFORMATION
30 Jun 2020 |
| INDIVIDUAL PERIOD | CUMULATIVE PERIOD | CURRENT YEAR QUARTER | PRECEDING YEAR
CORRESPONDING
QUARTER | CURRENT YEAR TO DATE | PRECEDING YEAR
CORRESPONDING
PERIOD | 30 Jun 2020 | 30 Jun 2019 | 30 Jun 2020 | 30 Jun 2019 | $$'000 | $$'000 | $$'000 | $$'000 |
1 | Revenue | 1,499,300 | 2,544,100 | 3,760,200 | 5,050,800 | 2 | Profit/(loss) before tax | -57,400 | 118,900 | -110,700 | 170,400 | 3 | Profit/(loss) for the period | -66,100 | 84,100 | -141,600 | 95,500 | 4 | Profit/(loss) attributable to ordinary equity holders of the parent | -73,700 | 24,300 | -146,700 | 1,900 | 5 | Basic earnings/(loss) per share (Subunit) | -3.64 | 1.20 | -7.24 | 0.09 | 6 | Proposed/Declared dividend per share (Subunit) | 0.00 | 0.00 | 0.00 | 0.00 |
|
| AS AT END OF CURRENT QUARTER | AS AT PRECEDING FINANCIAL YEAR END | 7
| Net assets per share attributable to ordinary equity holders of the parent ($$) | 1.7600 | 1.8400
|
https://www.theedgemarkets.com/a ... ion-pharma-segments |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
发表于 27-8-2020 09:58 PM
|
显示全部楼层
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
发表于 28-8-2020 07:42 AM
|
显示全部楼层
SUMMARY OF KEY FINANCIAL INFORMATION
31 Mar 2020 |
| INDIVIDUAL PERIOD | CUMULATIVE PERIOD | CURRENT YEAR QUARTER | PRECEDING YEAR
CORRESPONDING
QUARTER | CURRENT YEAR TO DATE | PRECEDING YEAR
CORRESPONDING
PERIOD | 31 Mar 2020 | 31 Mar 2019 | 31 Mar 2020 | 31 Mar 2019 | $$'000 | $$'000 | $$'000 | $$'000 |
1 | Revenue | 2,260,900 | 2,506,700 | 2,260,900 | 2,506,700 | 2 | Profit/(loss) before tax | -53,300 | 51,500 | -53,300 | 51,500 | 3 | Profit/(loss) for the period | -75,600 | 11,400 | -75,600 | 11,400 | 4 | Profit/(loss) attributable to ordinary equity holders of the parent | -73,100 | -22,400 | -73,100 | -22,400 | 5 | Basic earnings/(loss) per share (Subunit) | -3.60 | -1.11 | -3.60 | -1.11 | 6 | Proposed/Declared dividend per share (Subunit) | 0.00 | 0.00 | 0.00 | 0.00 |
|
| AS AT END OF CURRENT QUARTER | AS AT PRECEDING FINANCIAL YEAR END | 7
| Net assets per share attributable to ordinary equity holders of the parent ($$) | 1.7700 | 1.8400
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
发表于 1-9-2020 10:10 PM
|
显示全部楼层
本帖最后由 icy97 于 6-1-2021 09:05 AM 编辑
Date of change | 01 Sep 2020 | Name | DATO' ABDUL HAMID BIN SH. MOHAMED | Age | 55 | Gender | Male | Nationality | Malaysia | Designation | Director | Directorate | Independent and Non Executive | Type of change | Appointment | QualificationsNo | Qualifications | Major/Field of Study | Institute/University | Additional Information | 1 | Professional Qualification | Fellow | Association of Chartered Certified Accountants | |
Working experience and occupation | - 2003 to Present Executive Director, Symphony House Sdn Bhd.- 1998 to 2003 - Senior Vice-President, Strategic Planning & International Affairs, Kuala Lumpur Stock Exchange (now known as Bursa Malaysia Berhad). He was promoted to Deputy President and later re-designated as Chief Financial Officer as his last position. - 1994 to 1998 - Senior Manager, Corporate Planning, Amanah Capital Malaysia Berhad.- 1989 to 1994 - Officer, Corporate Banking, Bumiputera Merchant Bankers Berhad. His last position was Manager in the Corporate Banking Department. - 1989 - Corporate Services Assistant, Messrs. Lim Ali & Co/Arthur Young (now known as Ernst & Young). | Directorships in public companies and listed issuers (if any) | MMC Corporation BerhadMaybank Investment Bank BerhadEkuiti Nasional Berhad |
Type | Announcement | Subject | OTHERS | Description | Dato' Abdul Hamid Sh. Mohamed joins Boustead Board of Directors. | |
https://www.theedgemarkets.com/article/boustead-denies-management-attempting-block-ltats-privatisation-bid
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
发表于 7-9-2020 05:37 PM
|
显示全部楼层
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
发表于 3-10-2020 05:52 AM
|
显示全部楼层
本帖最后由 icy97 于 14-11-2020 10:06 AM 编辑
Type | Announcement | Subject | OTHERS | Description | BOUSTEAD HOLDINGS BERHAD ("BHB" OR "COMPANY")POSSIBLE PRIVATISATION OF THE COMPANY ("PROPOSAL") | We refer to the announcements dated 28 May 2020 in relation to the Proposal ("Announcements").
The Company wishes to announce that the Company had today received a press notice from Lembaga Tabung Angkatan Tentera ("LTAT") informing that there has been no material development in respect of the Proposal.
As highlighted in the Announcements, the Proposal is subject to, amongst others, the finalisation of the structure of the Proposal, the requisite funding for the Proposal and the required regulatory approval(s) for the Proposal.
THE COMPANY WISHES TO HIGHLIGHT THAT THE PRESS NOTICE ISSUED BY LTAT DOES NOT AMOUNT TO A FIRM INTENTION BY LTAT TO UNDERTAKE THE PROPOSAL. ACCORDINGLY, THERE CAN BE NO CERTAINTY THAT LTAT WILL PROCEED WITH THE PROPOSAL.
Please refer to the attached press notice by LTAT for further details.
SHAREHOLDERS ARE ADVISED TO EXERCISE CAUTION AND SEEK APPROPRIATE INDEPENDENT ADVICE WHEN DEALING IN THE BHB SHARES SINCE THERE IS NO CERTAINTY THAT LTAT WILL PROCEED WITH THE PROPOSAL.
This announcement is dated 26 June 2020. | https://www.bursamalaysia.com/market_information/announcements/company_announcement/announcement_details?ann_id=3062689
Type | Announcement | Subject | OTHERS | Description | BOUSTEAD HOLDINGS BERHAD ("BHB" OR "COMPANY")POSSIBLE PRIVATISATION OF THE COMPANY ("PROPOSAL") | We refer to the announcements dated 28 May 2020, 29 May 2020 and 26 June 2020 in relation to the Proposal (“Announcements”).
The Company wishes to announce that the Company had today received a press notice from Lembaga Tabung Angkatan Tentera (“LTAT”) informing that the Securities Commission Malaysia had, vide its letter dated 24 July 2020, approved LTAT’s application for an extension of time until 27 October 2020 for LTAT to announce its firm intention in relation to the Proposal.
Save for the above, there has been no material development in respect of the Proposal.
As highlighted in the Announcements, the Proposal is subject to, amongst others, the finalisation of the structure of the Proposal, the requisite funding for the Proposal and the required regulatory approval(s) for the Proposal.
THE COMPANY WISHES TO HIGHLIGHT THAT THE PRESS NOTICE ISSUED BY LTAT DOES NOT AMOUNT TO A FIRM INTENTION BY LTAT TO UNDERTAKE THE PROPOSAL. ACCORDINGLY, THERE CAN BE NO CERTAINTY THAT LTAT WILL PROCEED WITH THE PROPOSAL.
Please refer to the attached press notice by LTAT for further details.
SHAREHOLDERS ARE ADVISED TO EXERCISE CAUTION AND SEEK APPROPRIATE INDEPENDENT ADVICE WHEN DEALING IN THE BHB SHARES SINCE THERE IS NO CERTAINTY THAT LTAT WILL PROCEED WITH THE PROPOSAL.
This announcement is dated 27 July 2020. | https://www.bursamalaysia.com/market_information/announcements/company_announcement/announcement_details?ann_id=3071986
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
发表于 12-10-2020 08:03 AM
|
显示全部楼层
Date of change | 01 Jul 2020 | Name | ENCIK IZADDEEN BIN DAUD | Age | 51 | Gender | Male | Nationality | Malaysia | Type of change | Redesignation | Previous Position | Independent Director | New Position | Executive Director | Directorate | Executive | QualificationsNo | Qualifications | Major/Field of Study | Institute/University | Additional Information | 1 | Professional Qualification | Certified Financial Planner | Financial Planning Association of Malaysia | | 2 | Professional Qualification | Public Accountant | Institute of Public Accountant, Australia | Fellow Member | 3 | Degree | B.Sc (Hons) Accounting and Law | De Monfort University, Leicestar, United Kingdom | |
Working experience and occupation | - 1991 - Auditor, Ernst & Young - 1992 - Senior Officer, Oriental Bank Berhad - 1992 to 1998 - Senior Manager, Perwira Affin Merchant Bank Berhad - 1999 to 2006 - Assistant Vice President, Permodalan Nasional Berhad - 2006 to 2007 - Chief Executive Officer, ASM Investment Services Berhad - 2007 to 2009 - Managing Director, MARA Incorporated He is currently the Executive Chairman of E&E Gas Sdn Bhd. |
Type | Announcement | Subject | OTHERS | Description | Encik Izaddeen bin Daud appointed as Executive Director of Boustead Holdings Berhad. | |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
发表于 14-10-2020 08:24 AM
|
显示全部楼层
Date of change | 01 Jul 2020 | Name | ENCIK FAHMY BIN ISMAIL | Age | 44 | Gender | Male | Nationality | Malaysia | Type of change | Cessation Of Office | Designation | Chief Operating Officer | Reason | Encik Fahmy Ismail will helm and focus on the Group's finance roles. | Details of any disagreement that he/she has with the Board of Directors | No | Whether there are any matters that need to be brought to the attention of shareholders | No | QualificationsNo | Qualifications | Major/Field of Study | Institute/University | Additional Information | 1 | Professional Qualification | Chartered Accountant | Malaysian Institute of Accountants | | 2 | Professional Qualification | Certified Practicing Accountant | CPA Australia | | 3 | Degree | Accounting and Finance | University of Sydney, Australia | |
| | Working experience and occupation | Encik Fahmy Ismail joined Boustead Holdings Berhad in 2006 as Manager, Corporate Planning. He rose to various positions within Boustead Group. In 2014 he was appointed Chief Executive Officer of Boustead Plantations Berhad until June 2018. Concurrently, in January 2017 he assumed the role of Director, Financial Services of Boustead Holdings Berhad. He was then appointed as Group Finance Director of Boustead Holdings Berhad in October 2017 to present. He was appointed as Chief Operating Officer on 1 January 2019. | Family relationship with any director and/or major shareholder of the listed issuer | Nil | Any conflict of interests that he/she has with the listed issuer | Nil | Details of any interest in the securities of the listed issuer or its subsidiaries | - 1,000 Ordinary Shares in the listed subsidiary, Boustead Plantations Berhad- 100 Ordinary Shares in the listed subsidiary, Pharmaniaga Berhad |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
发表于 8-12-2020 07:11 AM
|
显示全部楼层
Type | Announcement | Subject | OTHERS | Description | Clarification On News Article Appearing In The Edge Markets Titled Boustead Holdings Sues Former Chairman, Ex-MD And Four Former Directors For £6.4 Million | Reference is made to the news article titled “Boustead Holdings sues former Chairman, ex-MD and four former Directors for £6.4 million” appearing on the online news portal of The Edge Markets dated 11 August 2020.
The Board of Directors of Boustead Holdings Berhad wishes to clarify that a writ has indeed been filed on 29 June 2020 against the following persons, for a claim of up to £6.4 million or other sum deemed fit by the Court, for breaching their fiduciary obligations as Directors under the Companies Act 1965. The writ is yet to be served. - Mohd Ghazali Haji Che Mat
- Che Lodin Wok Kamaruddin
- Megat Abdul Rahman Megat Ahmad
- Azzat bin Kamaludin
- Ghazali bin Mohd Ali
- Tan Leh Kiah
Announcement on the development of the above matter will be made in due course.
This announcement is dated 11 August 2020.
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
发表于 18-12-2020 09:09 AM
|
显示全部楼层
本帖最后由 icy97 于 11-7-2021 08:53 AM 编辑
Date of change | 21 Aug 2020 | Name | DATO' HAJJAH ZURAINAH BINTI MUSA | Age | 58 | Gender | Female | Nationality | Malaysia | Designation | Director | Directorate | Non Independent and Non Executive | Type of change | Appointment | QualificationsNo | Qualifications | Major/Field of Study | Institute/University | Additional Information | 1 | Doctorate | Management | Universiti Kuala Lumpur | 2020 (in progress) | 2 | Masters | Business Administration | Berjaya University College of Hospitality | 2016 | 3 | Diploma | Human Resource Management | University of Newcastle, Australia | 1997 | 4 | Diploma | Occupational Health & Safety | University of New South Wales/NSCA | 1993 | 5 | Diploma | Secretarial Science | Universiti Teknologi MARA | 1983 |
Working experience and occupation | Dato' Hajjah Zurainah started work in 1983 and was working in senior capacities for several organisations, both locally and internationally before she founded Permata Kancil (M) Sdn Bhd in 1995. She was the Managing Director of Permata Kancil (M) Sdn Bhd, a company involved in Human Resource Management and Consultancy.Dato' Hajjah Zurainah has more than 25 years of experience in the field of Human Resource Management and Development as well as Human Relationship Management. Her experience includes inter-alia, the designing, developing, managing, organising and conducting training programs, seminars and courses as well as the provision of consulting services relating to the various aspects of Human Resource Development and Management for organisations in Malaysia, Australia, United States of America, Indonesia and the Middle East. Currently, she is an Executive Director of Berjaya Corporation Berhad and Berjaya Times Square Sdn Bhd. She is also a Director of UZMA Berhad and a member of the Board of Governors for Berjaya University College of Hospitality, and holds directorships in several other private limited companies in the Berjaya Corporation group of companies. | Directorships in public companies and listed issuers (if any) | - Berjaya Corporation Berhad- UZMA Berhad- Tioman Island Resort Berhad |
Type | Announcement | Subject | OTHERS | Description | Boustead Announces Two Board Appointments. |
| https://www.bursamalaysia.com/market_information/announcements/company_announcement/announcement_details?ann_id=3079805
Type | Announcement | Subject | OTHERS | Description | Boustead Holdings Berhad - Tenure of Managing Director | The Board of Boustead Holdings Berhad ("BHB") wishes to announce that BHB has agreed to shorten Dato' Sri Amrin Awaluddin's ("Dato' Sri Amrin") tenure as Managing Director. His tenure will expire on 15 November 2020.
This decision was made to allow Dato' Sri Amrin to pursue other opportunities.
Please refer to the Press Statement attached below.
This announcement is dated 6 November 2020. | https://www.bursamalaysia.com/market_information/announcements/company_announcement/announcement_details?ann_id=3103347
Date of change | 15 Nov 2020 | Name | DATO SRI AMRIN BIN AWALUDDIN | Age | 54 | Gender | Male | Nationality | Malaysia | Designation | Managing Director | Directorate | Executive | Type of change | Cessation of Office | Reason | Cessation of contract with effect from 15 November 2020. | Details of any disagreement that he/she has with the Board of Directors | No | Whether there are any matters that need to be brought to the attention of shareholders | No | QualificationsNo | Qualifications | Major/Field of Study | Institute/University | Additional Information | 1 | Professional Qualification | Member | Malaysian Institute of Accountants | | 2 | Masters | Business Administration (Finance) | The University of Hull, United Kingdom | | 3 | Professional Qualification | Chartered Institute of Management Accountants | Global Chartered Management Accountants, United Kingdom | | 4 | Degree | Bachelor of Business Administration (Honours) | Acadia University, Nova Scotia, Canada | |
Working experience and occupation | - August 2020 - Director, Universiti Kebangsaan Malaysia.- 6 May 2019 to 15 November 2020 - Managing Director, Boustead Holdings Berhad.- September 2017 to May 2019 - Group Managing Director, Sime Darby Property Berhad.- September 2009 to July 2017 - Group Managing Director, Media Prima Berhad.- August 2017 to September 2017 - Executive Director, Media Prima Berhad.- April 2008 to September 2009 - Chief Executive Officer, Sistem Televisyen Malaysia Berhad.- January 2006 to April 2008 - Chief Executive Officer, Natseven TV Sdn Bhd.- October 2003 to December 2005 - Group Chief Financial Officer, Media Prima Berhad.- November 2001 to September 2003 - Chief Financial Officer, Media Prima Berhad.- May 2001 to November 2001 - Chief Operating Officer, Putera Capital Berhad.- October 1999 to April 2001 - Head of Corporate Finance, Malaysian Resources Corporation Berhad.- May 1996 to October 1999 - Senior General Manager, Renong Berhad.- August 1990 to May 1996 - Manager, Structured & Project Finance, Amanah Merchant Bank Berhad.- January 1990 to August 1990 - Officer, Corporate & Commercial Loans, Development & Commercial Bank Berhad. |
Date of change | 01 Dec 2020 | Name | DATO' SRI MOHAMMED SHAZALLI BIN RAMLY | Age | 59 | Gender | Male | Nationality | Malaysia | Designation | Group Managing Director | Directorate | Executive | Type of change | Appointment | QualificationsNo | Qualifications | Major/Field of Study | Institute/University | Additional Information | 1 | Masters | Master of Business Administration | St. Louis University, Missouri, USA | | 2 | Degree | Bachelor of Science (Marketing) | Indiana University Bloomington, Indiana, USA | | 3 | Diploma | Diploma | Universiti Teknologi MARA Perlis | |
Working experience and occupation | - April 2017 to June 2018 - Managing Director/Chief Executive Officer, Telekom Malaysia Berhad.- 2016 to 2017 - Regional Chief Executive Officer and Corporate Executive Vice President, Axiata Group Berhad.- 2005 to 2016 - Chief Executive Officer and Director, Celcom Axiata Berhad.- 1998 to 2005 - Chief Executive Officer, NTV7.- 1996 to 1997 - Marketing Director, ASTRO.- 1993 to 1996 - Group Brand International Marketing Manager, Malaysian Tobacco Company and British American Tobacco.- 1987 to 1993 - Group Brand Manager, Unilever. |
Type | Announcement | Subject | OTHERS | Description | Dato' Sri Mohammed Shazalli Ramly appointed as Group Managing Director of Boustead Holdings Berhad | |
SUMMARY OF KEY FINANCIAL INFORMATION
30 Sep 2020 |
| INDIVIDUAL PERIOD | CUMULATIVE PERIOD | CURRENT YEAR QUARTER | PRECEDING YEAR
CORRESPONDING
QUARTER | CURRENT YEAR TO DATE | PRECEDING YEAR
CORRESPONDING
PERIOD | 30 Sep 2020 | 30 Sep 2019 | 30 Sep 2020 | 30 Sep 2019 | $$'000 | $$'000 | $$'000 | $$'000 |
1 | Revenue | 1,890,800 | 2,734,700 | 5,651,000 | 7,785,500 | 2 | Profit/(loss) before tax | -14,300 | -156,400 | -125,000 | 14,000 | 3 | Profit/(loss) for the period | -35,000 | -187,500 | -176,700 | -92,000 | 4 | Profit/(loss) attributable to ordinary equity holders of the parent | -51,800 | -155,000 | -198,600 | -153,100 | 5 | Basic earnings/(loss) per share (Subunit) | -2.56 | -7.65 | -9.80 | -7.55 | 6 | Proposed/Declared dividend per share (Subunit) | 0.00 | 0.00 | 0.00 | 0.00 |
|
| AS AT END OF CURRENT QUARTER | AS AT PRECEDING FINANCIAL YEAR END | 7
| Net assets per share attributable to ordinary equity holders of the parent ($$) | 1.7400 | 1.8400
|
Type | Announcement | Subject | OTHERS | Description | Boustead Posts Q3 Revenue of RM1.9 Billion | |
Type | Announcement | Subject | OTHERS | Description | BOUSTEAD HOLDINGS BERHAD IS COMMITTED TO UPHOLDING INTEGRITY AND ANTI-CORRUPTION PRACTICES | |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
| |
本周最热论坛帖子
|